Accounts and annual returns NORTH CESTRIAN GRAMMAR SCHOOL LIMITED

Charity Number: 525925
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 February 2022 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2022 Not submitted
Annual return 28 February 2021 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 Not submitted
Annual return 29 February 2020 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 Not submitted
Annual return 28 February 2019 06 October 2020 283 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2019 Not Required