NORTH CESTRIAN GRAMMAR SCHOOL LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our principal activity as an educational charity for children between 11-18 year olds, is to benefit the public by providing a first class education independant of the State system. The School's strategic aim is to attain sound academic standards and offer extracurricular benefits and pastoral support, helping each child to realise his potential.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 28 February 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
- Salford City
- Stockport
- Trafford
- Warrington
Governance
- 14 September 1972: Standard registration
- 12 May 2022: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2014 | 31/08/2015 | 28/02/2017 | 28/02/2018 | 28/02/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.26m | £2.29m | £2.98m | £805 | £1 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.47m | £4.51m | £2.83m | £29.25k | £13.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | £0 | £5.55k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £327.64k | £315.40k | £353.11k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £1.90m | £1.97m | £2.33m | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £2.22k | £1.76k | £579 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £25.06k | £4.85k | £284.35k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £2.47m | £4.50m | £2.47m | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £9.62k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £8.74k | £7.21k | £11.21k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £345.74k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2019 | 06 October 2020 | 283 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 14TH JULY 1972 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 18TH NOVEMBER 1989 AND 2 MAY 2001
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN ALL ITS BRANCHES AND IN CONNECTION THEREWITH TO ACQUIRE, DEVELOP, CONDUCT AND CARRY ON A SCHOOL OR SCHOOLS AS WELL RESIDENTIAL AS NON-RESIDENTIAL OR PARTLY RESIDENTIAL AND PARTLY NON-RESIDENTIAL IN WHICH BOYS OR IF THOUGHT FIT BOYS AND GIRLS OF ALL SECTIONS OF THE COMMUNITY MAY RECEIVE A SOUND GENERAL EDUCATION
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window