Accounts and annual returns STOCKPORT GRAMMAR SCHOOL

Charity number: 525936
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2007 16 April 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2006 22 June 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2006 23 June 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2005 12 January 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2005 22 December 2005 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2004 31 January 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2004 10 January 2005 On Time