MOTTRAM-IN-LONGDENDALE BROADBOTTOM SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing financial support for Broadbottom C of E School (or Mottram C of E School) in areas which would not normally be supported financially by the LEA.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Tameside
Governance
- 14 October 1964: Standard registration
- BROADBOTTOM SCHOOL TRUST (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CLAIRE BIBBY | Chair | 06 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Hazel Adele Bridle | Trustee | 06 February 2025 |
|
|||||
Catherine Mary Rogerson | Trustee | 12 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kevin William Hall | Trustee | 12 June 2024 |
|
|||||
Dorothy Stringer | Trustee | 06 December 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.49k | £0 | £95 | £112 | £106 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £2.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 06 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 4TH FEBRUARY 1998
Charitable objects
1. PROVIDING FOR THE SCHOOL OR ANY OTHER C OF E SCHOOL IN THE AOB SPECIAL BENEFITS NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE L.E.A. 2. IN SUCH OTHER WAYS AS THE MANAGING TRUSTEES THINK FIT THE EDUCATION OF THE CHILDREN ATTENDING SCHOOL OR ANY OTHER CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF MOTTRAM-IN-LONGDENDALE
Contact information
- Address:
-
19 Summerbottom
Broadbottom
HYDE
Cheshire
SK14 6BP
- Phone:
- 01457 763758
- Email:
- bibclai@aol.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window