Accounts and annual returns CHRIST CHURCH, CHURCH OF ENGLAND (AIDED) SCHOOL ELLESMERE PORT

Charity number: 525945
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 January 2024 11 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2024 Not Required
Annual return 01 January 2023 24 April 2024 175 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2023 Not Required
Annual return 01 January 2022 19 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2022 Not Required
Annual return 01 January 2021 21 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2021 Not Required
Annual return 01 January 2020 16 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2020 Not Required