THE CYRIL EDWARD GOURLEY VICTORIA CROSS ENDOWMENT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Distributing annual grants to university students in the area covered by the West Kirby secondary schools
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Wirral
Governance
- 25 January 1965: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Twist | Chair | 24 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sian Turner | Trustee | 10 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Cherry Povall | Trustee | 05 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sofia Katerina Palios | Trustee | 11 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Noel Sharp | Trustee | 17 February 2024 |
|
|||||
ANTHONY COX | Trustee | 16 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Simeon Clarke | Trustee | 22 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Gray | Trustee | 28 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Ann Ellis | Trustee | 20 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Johnson | Trustee | 14 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mark Bellamy | Trustee | 01 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
CAROLINE ASHCROFT | Trustee | 06 November 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.21k | £634 | £821 | £809 | £983 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.10k | £750 | £300 | £600 | £840 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 30 SEPTEMBER 1919 AND SCHEME OF THE 8 AUGUST 1975
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE IN ONE SCHOLARSHIP OF £50 PER ANNUM OR SUCH OTHER SUM AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.... TENABLE AT THE UNIVERSITY OF LIVERPOOL FOR A PERIOD OF THREE YEARS AND OPEN TO ANY BOY OR GIRL WHO SHALL FOR TWO YEARS PRIOR TO THE AWARD HAVE RESIDED WITHIN THE BENEFICIAL AREA, OR ANY BOY ATTENDING OR WHO HAS ATTENDED THE CALDAY GRANGE GRAMMAR SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
HOYLAKE AND WEST KIRBY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Calday Grange Grammar School
Grammar School Lane
WIRRAL
Merseyside
CH48 8GG
- Phone:
- 01516252727
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window