THE DR MARY THOMPSON PENRICE TRUST FUND (IN CONNEXION WITH WIRRAL GRAMMAR SCHOOL FOR GIRLS)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Exhibitions, bursaries and maintenance allowance or financial help.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Wirral
Governance
- 16 June 1964: Standard registration
- THE DR MARY THOMPSON PENRICE TRUST FUND (IN CONNEXION WITH WIRRAL CITY GRAMMAR SCHL FOR GRLS (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
WIRRAL COUNCIL | Trustee | 18 December 2012 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £45 | £6 | £12 | £139 | £312 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 26 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 November 2024 | 300 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 June 2023 | 129 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2022 | 361 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL PROVED 18TH FEBRUARY 1960
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION OF ASSISTANCE FOR HIGHER EDUCATION BY MEANS OF EXHIBITIONS, BURSARIES OR MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES OR FINANCIAL HELP TO ENABLE BENEFICIARIES TO PREPARE FOR, OR TO ENTER, A TRADE, PROFESSION OR CALLING.
Area of benefit
BOROUGH OF BEBINGTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
DIRECTOR OF FINANCE
P O BOX 2
TREASURY BUILDING
CLEVELAND STREET
BIRKENHEAD, MERSEYSIDE
CH41 6BU
- Phone:
- 01516663414
- Email:
- carolewilliams@wirral.gov.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window