THE ST AMBROSE COLLEGE CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity's main Object is the advancement of education and the Catholic religion by sharing the financial burden involved in providing accommodation and facilities required by Saint Ambrose College, a state-funded independent Catholic grammar school in Hale Barns, Cheshire.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Trafford
Governance
- 11 December 1963: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kieren Done | Trustee | 14 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mary Ireland | Trustee | 10 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL JOHN HETHERINGTON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £39.81k | £26.80k | £24.45k | £32.51k | £30.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £61.23k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 15 April 2025 | 69 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 15 April 2025 | 69 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 05 March 2024 | 29 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 05 March 2024 | 29 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 17 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 11 March 2022 | 34 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 19 April 2022 | 73 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 12 April 2021 | 66 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 11 May 2021 | 95 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 10TH OCTOBER 1955
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND THE CATHOLIC RELIGION BY SHARING THE FINANCIAL BURDEN INVOLVED IN PROVIDING THE ACCOMMODATION AND FACILITIES REQUIRED BY ST. AMBROSE COLLEGE, HALE.
Area of benefit
HALE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Hale Road
Hale Barns
Altrincham
Greater Manchester
WA15 0HE
- Phone:
- 01619802711
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window