Accounts and annual returns WILLIAM GLEGGE'S FOUNDATION

Charity number: 526022
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2011 01 November 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2011 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2010 02 November 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2010 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2009 10 January 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2009 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2008 24 July 2009 54 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2008 Not Required