Accounts and annual returns CHARITIES ADMINISTERED IN CONNECTION WITH ALTRINCHAM GRAMMAR SCHOOL FOR GIRLS

Charity Number: 526023
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 April 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2017 Not submitted
Annual return 01 April 2016 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2016 Not submitted
Annual return 01 April 2015 08 October 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2015 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2014 22 September 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2014 Not Required