Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ALL SAINTS NORTH STREET, YORK

Charity number: 1212556
Recently registered

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rt Revd Glyn Hamilton Webster Chair 07 June 2022
PARISH ESTATE CHARITY (ALL SAINTS, NORTH STREET)
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY'S BISHOPHILL JUNIOR, YORK
Recently registered
Jeremy Peter Robert Nolan Trustee 22 May 2022
PARISH ESTATE CHARITY (ALL SAINTS, NORTH STREET)
Received: On time
STEVEN RICHARD ASTON Trustee 16 September 2015
PARISH ESTATE CHARITY (ALL SAINTS, NORTH STREET)
Received: On time
Charles William Agg Trustee 15 April 2002
WIGGINTON BOWLING CLUB
Received: On time
DAVID ANTHONY GEORGE TITCHENER Trustee 12 April 1999
PARISH ESTATE CHARITY (ALL SAINTS, NORTH STREET)
Received: On time
Dr ROBERT DADD CAMPLING RICHARDS Trustee 27 May 1989
PARISH ESTATE CHARITY (ALL SAINTS, NORTH STREET)
Received: On time
ESCRICK SCHOOL FUND
Received: On time
THE FEOFFEES OF ST MICHAEL'S SPURRIERGATE, YORK
Received: On time
ST HELEN'S BELL FUND CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
Merry Rose Cecil Norman Trustee
None on record
Clarissa, Wei Yee Nolan Trustee
None on record
John George Norman Trustee
None on record
Timothy John Moore Trustee
None on record