DAVID WALSH
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charities objectives are; 1. To promote the education of persons under the age of 25 years resident in Harwood and surrounding areas. 2. The general benefit of the inhabitants of the area of benefit as the Trustees see fit. The Trustees have adopted a policy of awarding grants as a means of achieving these objectives.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2010
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Bolton
- Lancashire
Governance
- 03 September 1963: Standard registration
- 26 October 2011: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 26 October 2011: Funds transferred to 222819 PROVINCIAL/WALSH TRUST FOR BOLTON
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2006 | 31/12/2007 | 31/12/2008 | 31/12/2009 | 31/12/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.32k | £15.05k | £19.95k | £17.21k | £15.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.28k | £11.55k | £13.13k | £7.25k | £14.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2010 | 11 October 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2010 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2009 | 08 October 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2009 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2008 | 26 August 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2008 | 01 September 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2007 | 24 December 2008 | 54 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2007 | 08 January 2009 | 69 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 20TH MAY 2005
Charitable objects
1. TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF PERSONS UNDER THE AGE OF 25 YEARS RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT 2. THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT IN SUCH A MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT
Area of benefit
THE TOWNSHIP OF HARWOOD AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window