FRANCES MARY TICKLE TRUST FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The trust distributed all of it reserves year ended 30 September 2005.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2009
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Liverpool City
Governance
- 15 January 1965: Standard registration
- 26 January 2010: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2004 | 30/09/2007 | 30/09/2008 | 30/09/2009 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £10 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2009 | 05 January 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2009 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2008 | 08 December 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2008 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2007 | 08 December 2008 | 131 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2005 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 26TH JUNE 1958
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION OF TWO PRIZES TO BE AWARDED ANNUALLY ONE TO BE GIVEN FOR GOOD CONDUCT TO A SENIOR BOY SELECTED BY THE VOTES OF THE MALE TEACHERS OF THE SCHOOL AND ONE TO BE GIVEN FOR GOOD CONDUCT TOA A SENIOR GIRL SELECTED BY THE VOTES OF THE FEMALE TEACHERS OF THE SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
LIVERPOOL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window