THE WIGAN FOUNDATION FOR TECHNICAL EDUCATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF STUDENTS ATTENDING WIGAN & LEIGH COLLEGE. SUPPORT IS PROVIDED PRIMARILY BY MEANS OF HARDSHIP PAYMENTS TO INDIVIDUAL STUDENTS AND BY SUPPORTING OR SUBSIDISING EDUCATIONAL VISITS & ACTIVITIES WHICH ARE OF BENEFIT EITHER TO STUDENTS STUDIES OR WHICH ADVANCE STUDENTS CULTURAL & SOCIAL EDUCATION.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Wigan
Governance
- 01 September 1974: Standard registration
- WIGAN FOUNDATION FOR TECHNICAL EDUCATION (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALBERT RICHARD WATERFIELD | Chair | 28 March 2011 |
|
|
||||
JOHN WRIGHT | Trustee | 13 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
Anna Dawe | Trustee | 26 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
DIANE BRENNAN | Trustee | 08 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH SHEA | Trustee | 06 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
GERARD MARTIN BRETHERTON | Trustee | 28 March 2011 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP COLLIER | Trustee | 28 March 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £60.45k | £60.82k | £61.42k | £61.79k | £61.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £57.80k | £57.31k | £62.46k | £56.83k | £83.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 21 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 21 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 29 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 29 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 30 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 30 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 04 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 04 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 11 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 11 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 17TH MARCH 1999
Charitable objects
(1)TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF STUDENTS ATTENDING THE COLLEGE. IF AND SO FAR AS THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY CANNOT BE APPLIED TOWARDS THE OBJECT ABOVE IT MAY BE APPLIED TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF PERSONS UNDER THE AGE OF 25 YEARS WHO ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- 01 September 1974 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
17 Coniston Avenue
WIGAN
WN1 2EY
- Phone:
- 07774157149
- Email:
- s.scott@wigan-leigh.ac.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window