Accounts and annual returns G WHITEHEAD SCHOLARSHIP FUND

Charity Number: 526130
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2013 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2012 05 October 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2011 17 November 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2010 08 October 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 Not Required