Financial history THE OLDHAM ENGINEERING GROUP TRAINING ASSOCIATION LIMITED

Charity Number: 526145
Charity reporting is up to date (250 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023
Total gross income £631.48k £692.94k £598.93k £664.03k £724.22k
Total expenditure £668.31k £694.64k £540.52k £573.79k £872.12k
Income from government contracts £597.82k £615.91k £543.77k £560.03k £724.00k
Income from government grants N/A £6.66k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £11.10k £21.01k £30.61k £77.29k £0
Income - Charitable activities £620.01k £665.27k £567.77k £586.63k £722.78k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £371 £10 £550 £117 £1.43k
Income - Other £0 £6.66k £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £668.31k £694.64k £540.52k £573.79k £872.12k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £38.73k £32.15k £33.39k £34.41k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0