THE HARRIS CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Grant Making Charity assisting financially Persons Under the age of 25 with grants to Individuals and Organisations supporting young persons.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Lancashire
Governance
- 01 August 1963: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
EDWIN BOOTH CBE DL LLD | Chair | 19 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Margaret Dodd | Trustee | 23 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sally Joanne McCluskie BA,MS | Trustee | 30 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER ANNE LEWIS COULSTON-HERRMANN JP | Trustee | 19 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev PETER HAMBORG | Trustee | 19 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
KEITH MELLALIEU | Trustee | 19 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
SIMON WILLIAM JOHN HUCK LLB | Trustee | 22 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
PETER ROBERT METCALF MBE FCA | Trustee | 23 August 2018 |
|
|||||
TIMOTHY JAMES SCOTT FCSI | Trustee | 23 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr ANTHONY WILLIAM ANDREWS | Trustee | 24 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
NICOLA MARY FIELDEN | Trustee | 24 August 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £127.45k | £84.37k | £106.55k | £100.76k | £121.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £80.48k | £86.68k | £89.98k | £102.30k | £138.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 01 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 01 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 13 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 13 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 22 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 22 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 8 AUGUST 1985
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF PERSONS UNDER THE AGE OF 25 YEARS RESIDENT IN THE COUNTY OF LANCASHIRE WHO ARE IN NEED IN ONE OR MORE OF THE FOLLOWING WAYS OR IN SUCH OTHER WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT:- (A) IN RELIEVING THE NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS OF SUCH PERSONS (B) IN PROMOTING THE EDUCATION INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING OF SUCH PERSONS (C) IN PROVIDING FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, OUTFITS, CLOTHING, TOOLS, INSTRUMENTS, EQUIPMENT OR BOOKS TO ENABLE SUCH PERSONS ON LEAVING SCHOOL, UNIVERSITY OR OTHER EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT TO PREPARE FOR, OR TO ENTER, A PROFESSION, TRADE OR CALLING (D) IN APPRENTICING SUCH PERSONS TO SOME USEFUL PROFESSION, TRADE OR CALLING (E) IN PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION FOR SUCH PERSONS OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR SUCH PERSONS (F) IN MAKING GRANTS OR DONATIONS TO CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS OR ORGANISATIONS HAVING FOR THEIR OBJECT THE BENEFIT OF SUCH PERSONS. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 19 (2) OF THE SCHEME).
Area of benefit
COUNTY OF LANCASHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
RICHARD HOUSE
9 WINCKLEY SQUARE
PRESTON
PR1 3HP
- Phone:
- 01772821021
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window