COPP SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide fund for Copp School governors.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Lancashire
Governance
- 02 March 1964: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Paul Hunter | Trustee | 30 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
PAUL STUART GARRETT | Trustee | 30 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
KATH ROBSON | Trustee | 12 March 2008 |
|
|
||||
ALLAN MCDOUGALL | Trustee | 01 May 1996 |
|
|
||||
DAVID WHITTLE | Trustee | 12 March 1988 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.62k | £9.63k | £9.67k | £10.49k | £12.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.00k | £18.39k | £9.01k | £841 | £3.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 12 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 20 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 6TH FEBRUARY 1866
Charitable objects
THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN RESIDENT IN THE AREAS OF THE TOWNSHIP OF GREAT ECCLESTON AND THE PARISHES OF GREAT ECCLESTON CUM ELSWICK AND LARBRICK AND ALSO RELIGIOUS INSTRUCTION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PRINCIPLES OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND.
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Oak View
Hall Lane
Great Eccleston
PRESTON
PR3 0XN
- Phone:
- 01253696800
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window