Financial history NATIONAL SCHOOL

Charity number: 526219
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £2.30k £973 £1.57k £2.39k £7.42k
Total expenditure £2.05k £297 £2.83k £797 £8.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A