NATIONAL SCHOOL

Charity number: 526219
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The benefit of the National School in the Ecclesiastical Parish of Yealand Conyers in the County Palatine of Lancaster.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £7,421
Total expenditure: £8,049

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Lancashire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 02 June 1964: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • YEALAND C E SCHOOL (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Alice Ormondroyd Rev Trustee 18 March 2024
None on record
Clare Hunter Trustee 13 October 2022
None on record
Malcolm Frank Brown M F Trustee 26 March 2019
None on record
Dr Peter James Nicholson Trustee 10 March 2016
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £2.30k £973 £1.57k £2.39k £7.42k
Total expenditure £2.05k £297 £2.83k £797 £8.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 02 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 17 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 05 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 06 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 12 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF 15 MARCH 1888
Charitable objects
FOR THE PURPOSES OF THE NATIONAL SCHOOL IN THE PARISH OF YEALAND CONYERS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF YEALAND CONYERS
Registration history
  • 02 June 1964 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
Yealand C of E Primary School
Footeran Lane
Yealand Conyers
CARNFORTH
LA5 9SU
Phone:
01524781360
Website:

No information available