THE JOHN JAMES MORGAN PRIZE FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
makes grants to individuals (loans)
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Lancashire
Governance
- 19 August 1964: Standard registration
No other names
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOY HEADLEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20 | £20 | £5 | £5 | £12 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 06 February 2025 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 21 May 2024 | 106 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 01 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 19 April 2021 | 73 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 9TH JANUARY 1947
Charitable objects
THE ANNUAL AWARD OF A PRIZE TO THE STUDENT ATTENDING THE WALTON-LE-DALE HIGHER WALTON CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOL, WHO HAS MADE THE MOST PROGRESS IN ALL SCHOOL ACTIVITIES DURING THE YEAR.
Area of benefit
THE URBAN DISTRICT OF WALTON-LE-DALE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
HIGHER WALTON C OF E PRIMARY SCHOOL
ROSEWOOD AVENUE
HIGHER WALTON
PRESTON
PR5 4FE
- Phone:
- 01772335945
- Email:
- bursar@walton.lancs.sch.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window