AMELIA TASKER PRIZE FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Small fundraising or charitable donations for achievement prizes for children in school
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Lancashire
Governance
- 10 August 1964: Standard registration
- 09 September 2016: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £184 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £205 | £150 | £125 | £210 | £225 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 20 May 2015 | 109 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 04 June 2014 | 124 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
LETTER DATED 25TH SEPTEMBER 1956
Charitable objects
THE AWARD OF ANNUAL PRIZES FOR CHARACTER AND/OR PROFICIENCY, TO BE PRESENTED TO THE TWELVE BEST SHCOLARS OF THE ACCRINGTON NON-PROVIDED CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOLS.
Area of benefit
ACCRINGTON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window