Financial history EDWARD STOCKS-MASSEY BEQUEST FUND

Charity number: 526516
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £33.00k £23.02k £29.47k £31.76k £34.49k
Total expenditure £57.78k £57.19k £44.75k £48.72k £43.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A