THE WEST LANCASHIRE MASONIC EDUCATIONAL TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The relief of poverty and the advancement of education
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2007
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Lancashire
Governance
- 20 February 1964: Standard registration
- 01 April 2008: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 01 April 2008: Funds transferred to 239313 WEST LANCASHIRE FREEMASONS' CHARITY
- THE WEST LANCASHIRE MASONIC EDUCATIONAL TRUST (Working name)
- WEST LANCASHIRE MASONIC EDUCATIONAL INSTITUTION (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £42.01k | £42.03k | £56.53k | £68.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £55.44k | £41.08k | £37.40k | £50.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | 25 August 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | 31 August 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 06 September 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | 06 September 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 17 October 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | 17 October 2005 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | 03 November 2004 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | 03 November 2004 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 8TH JUNE 1855 BY-LAWS REVISED 2ND MARCH 1962
Charitable objects
THE RAISING OF FUNDS FOR THE CARE OF THE CHILDREN OF DECEASED OR DISTRESSED FREEMASONS IN THE PROVINCE OF WEST LANCASHIRE, OF THE UNITED GRAND LODGE OF FREEMASONS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM.
Area of benefit
PROVINCE OF WEST LANCASHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window