HINDLEY AND ABRAM GRAMMAR SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Foundation awards grants to students who are under 25 and are resident in the Wigan Metropolitan Borough.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Lancashire
- Wigan
Governance
- 23 June 1964: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR GEOFF PORTER | Chair |
|
|
|||||
ANGELA NAYLOR | Trustee | 16 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
VALERIE PARR | Trustee | 11 October 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30.54k | £25.04k | £23.11k | £25.83k | £28.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.84k | £17.37k | £21.93k | £43.27k | £73.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 13 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 20 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 07 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 2 MAY 1997
Charitable objects
(1) IN PROMOTING THE EDUCATION (INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING) OF PERSONS UNDER THE AGE OF 25 YEARS WHO OR WHOSE PARENTS ARE RESIDENT IN THE METROPOLITAN BOROUGH OF WIGAN WITH A PREFERENCE FOR SUCH PERSONS WHO ARE RESIDENT IN THE URBAN DISTRICT OF HINDLEY OR THE FORMER URBAN DISTRICT OF ABRAM WHO ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE
Area of benefit
METROPOLITAN BOROUGH OF WIGAN WITH A PREFERENCE TO THE FORMER URBAN DISTRICT OF HINDLEY OR THE FORMER URBAN DISTRUCT OF ABRAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
38 Edinburgh Drive
Hindley Green
Wigan
WN2 4HL
- Phone:
- 01942 254403
- Email:
- james38ed@talktalk.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window