Accounts and annual returns LAWRENCE HOUSE TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 526606
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2007 06 December 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2006 05 December 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2006 05 December 2006 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2005 07 December 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2005 07 December 2005 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2004 01 December 2004 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2004 01 December 2004 On Time