Governing document THOMAS WHITHAM SIXTH FORM
Charity number: 526619

Charity reporting is overdue by 1191 days
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEMES OF 5 MAY 1873, 19 MAY 1899, 1 JANUARY 1909 AND 13 AUGUST 1909, ARTICLES OF GOVERNMENT OF 1 JULY 1952 AND A RESOLUTION OF 18 JUNE 2009
Charitable objects
1) A DAY SCHOOL FOR BOYS. 2) EXHIBITIONS TENABLE AT ANY UNIVERSITY, UNIVERSITY COLLEGE, TRAINING COLLEGE FOR PUPILS OF BURNLEY GRAMMAR SCHOOL INTENDING TO ENTER THE TEACHING PROFESSION OR OTHER LIKE INSTITUTION OF HIGHER, INCLUDING PROFESSIONAL OR TECHNICAL INSTRUCTION.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.