Governing document STANTON EDUCATIONAL TRUST
Charity number: 526633

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF TRUST DATED 8 JUNE 1970 AMENDED 18 OCTOBER 1983 AND VARIED BY SCHEMES DATED 11 JULY 1994 AND 4 FEBRUARY 1997 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 16TH SEPTEMBER 2004.
Charitable objects
ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF JEWISH CHILDREN IN BOTH SECULAR MATTERS AND ORTHODOX JUDAISM PARTICULARLY THOSE BETWEEN THE AGES OF THREE AND ELEVEN WITH A PREFERENCE FOR PERSONS RESIDING IN SOUTH MANCHESTER AND NORTH CHESHIRE
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
SOUTH MANCHESTER AND NORTH CHESHIRE
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.