THE HULME HALL TRUST FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of Hulme Hall Trust Foundation are: The provision of assistance for higher education by means of grants to be awarded to students at the University of Manchester, including post-graduate and research students, and with preference for residents of Hulme Hall. The provision of benefits in connection with Hulme Hall (which includes the chapel and chaplaincy)
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Manchester City
Governance
- 13 July 1964: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RICHARD YOUNG | Chair |
|
|
|||||||||||
Michael Andrew Mercer | Trustee | 28 November 2013 |
|
|
||||||||||
DR GARETH EDWARD HUGHES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||
SUSAN JEE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||
REVD REVD GOMERSALL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||
The Right Reverend Mark Davies | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £38.01k | £34.25k | £39.13k | £44.73k | £46.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £44.07k | £41.92k | £42.61k | £42.93k | £52.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 11 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 11 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 17 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 17 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 21 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 21 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 09 May 2022 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 09 May 2022 | 9 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE 13 JULY 1964 AS VARIED BY SCHEME OF THE 23 JANUARY 1976 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 9 APRIL 2008
Charitable objects
A) THE PROVISION OF ASSISTANCE FOR HIGHER EDUCATION BY MEANS OF EXHIBITIONS TO BE AWARDED TO YOUNG MEN AND WOMEN WHO AR ABOUT TO BE ENGAGED IN A COURSE OF STUDY AT MANCHESTER UNIVERSITY INCLUDING POST GRADUATE AND RESEARCH STUDENTS. B) THE PROVISION OF BENEFITS IN CONNECTION WITH HULME HALL, WHICH BENEFITS MAY INCLUDE THE PURCHASE OF BOOKS FOR THE LIBRARY, AND PURCHASE OF MUSICAL INSTRUMENTS, THE MAINTENANCE OF FACILITIES FOR GAMES AND THE MAINTENANCE OF THE CHAPEL AND OF DIVINE SERVICE THERIN AND THE REPAIR AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE CHAPEL.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Butcher & Barlow Llp
3 Royal Mews
Gadbrook Park
Rudheath
Northwich
CW9 7UD
- Phone:
- 01606334309
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window