MRS CLOUGH'S FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
NO CHANGE
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Lancashire
Governance
- 28 November 1967: Standard registration
- 15 June 2021: Removed (Funds spent (by trustees))
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2015 | 30/09/2016 | 30/09/2017 | 30/09/2018 | 30/09/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £168 | £168 | £144 | £140 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £510 | £0 | £10 | £10 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 27 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2018 | 12 February 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2017 | 19 June 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2017 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 10TH NOVEMBER, 1893, AS AMENDED ON 17 JULY 2002 BY A RESOLUTION PASSED UNDER THE PROVISIONS OF SECTION 74(2)C OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993.
Charitable objects
PROVISION FOR FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO YOUNG PERSONS OF ABILITY IN POOR CIRCUMSTANCES, BORN IN THE COUNTY OF LANCASTER, WHO ARE STUDYING OR BEING EDUCATED AT ANY PLACE OF HIGHER EDUCATION APPROVED BY THE TRUSTEES, WITH A VIEW TO ENTER CHRISTIAN MINISTRY BEING PROTESTANTS AND DISSENTING FROM THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND.
Area of benefit
COUNTY OF LANCASTER
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window