Governing document HARTLEY VICTORIA METHODIST COLLEGE
Charity number: 526658
Removed charity
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED DATED 16TH JUNE 1880, AS AUGMENTED BY DEEDS DATED 25TH JUNE 1896, 7TH JUNE 1898, 2ND AUGUST 1905, 28TH DECEMBER 1905, AND 7TH DECEMBER 1906, AND SCHEME DATED 2ND FEBRUARY 1940
Charitable objects
A THEOLOGICAL INSTITUTION FOR THE TRAINING AND EDUCATION OF YOUNG MEN FOR THE MINISTRY OF THE PRIMITIVE METHODIST CONNEXION.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.