THE LIVERPOOL BOARD OF LEGAL STUDIES (INCORPORATED)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Liverpool City
Governance
- 25 October 1966: Standard registration
- 29 April 2008: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2004 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2004 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM OF ASSOCIATION DATED 1906
Charitable objects
(1) TO PROMOTE RESEARCH, TO ENCOURAGE STUDY AND TO PROVIDE INSTRUCTION IN THE PRINCIPLES AND PRACTICE OF THE LAW, AND IN ALL OTHER STUDIES WHICH CAN, IN THE OPINION OF THE ASSOCIATION, BE USEFULLY ALLIED THEREWITH (2) TO CONSIDER ALL QUESTIONS AFFECTING LEGAL EDUCATION OR THE ALTERATION R ADMINISTRATION OF THE LAW IN CONNECTION THEREWITH. (3) TO CO-OPERATIVE WITH, SUPPORT, AND AID BY GRANTS OF MONEY, BOOKS AND OTHERWISE THE UNIVERSITY OF LIVERPOOL AND THE FACULTY OF LAW THEREIN, THE INCORPORATED LAW STUDENS' ASSOCIATION OR ANY OTHER BODY CORPORATE, ASSOCIATION OR PERSON, IN THE ESTABLISHMENT AND MAINTENANCE OF AN EFFICIENT SYSTEM OF LEGAL IN THE CITY OF LIVERPOOL.(4) TO INSTITUTE, SUPPORT, MAINTAIN, SUBSIDISE, REGULATE AND MANAGE COUSES OF STUDY, LECTURES, CLASSES AND EXAMINATIONS IN LAW, TO CHARGE FEES TO STUDENTS ATTENDING SUCH COURSES OF STUDY, LECTURES, CLASSES OR EXAMINATIONS IN LAW, TO GRANT PRIZES, SCHOLARSHIPS AND EXHIBITIONS, FORM LAW LIBRARIES, SUPPLY PECUNIARY AND OTHER ASSISTENCE TO STUDENTS AND ADOPT SUCH OTHER MEANS AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE CONSIDERED EXPEDIENT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window