Financial history THE PRESTON POSTGRADUATE MEDICAL CENTRE

Charity number: 526668
Charity reporting is up to date (89 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £16.61k £12.65k £14.46k £16.72k £19.72k
Total expenditure £18.04k £2.71k £877 £1.03k £578
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A