Governing document ARNOLD SCHOOLS LIMITED
Charity Number: 526679
Removed charity
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 26 AUGUST 1937 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS PASSED 15 MAY 1980, 15 NOVEMBER 1996, 26 NOVEMBER 1997, 28 NOVEMBER 2000 AND 24 NOVEMBER 2005.
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE A SOUND EDUCATION AND TRAINING FOR CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE OF BOTH SEXES.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.