Ormskirk School Foundation Trust

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1. Charity makes grants to students attending the school who are taking part in a variety of out-of-school activities of adventure, experiance training etc and 2. For school projects-to help and enrich student learning and experience, not normally provided from the "education budget", and 3. Provides awards to students for achievement, endeavour and reliability.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

19 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Lancashire
Governance
- 25 October 1988: Standard registration
- CLIFF MEMORIAL FUND (Working name)
- LAURA MCELROY PRIZE ACCOUNT (Working name)
- RALPH TOMLINSON PRIZE ACCOUNT (Working name)
- ORMSKIRK GRAMMAR SCHOOL (Previous name)
- ORMSKIRK SCHOOL TRUST (Previous name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROSE HALSALL | Chair | 05 May 2019 |
|
|
||||||
JOHN MERCER | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Lisa Molyeneux | Trustee | 17 August 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Andrew Timon | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Angela Draper | Trustee | 13 January 2022 |
|
|||||||
Elaine Farrer | Trustee | 27 October 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Michael Wainwright | Trustee | 18 June 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Robert Bailey | Trustee | 10 June 2021 |
|
|
||||||
MRS M M WESTLEY | Trustee | 10 June 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Nikki Hennessy Cllr | Trustee | 09 June 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Edward Pope | Trustee | 10 May 2021 |
|
|
||||||
JANE MARSHALL | Trustee | 20 April 2021 |
|
|||||||
GARETH DOWLING | Trustee | 23 November 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Linda Webster | Trustee | 17 August 2019 |
|
|
||||||
GEORGE C SLAWINSKI | Trustee | 05 June 2019 |
|
|
||||||
STUART SMITH | Trustee | 12 November 2018 |
|
|
||||||
MR A OWENS | Trustee | 17 August 2018 |
|
|||||||
Hilary Anne Rosbotham | Trustee | 17 August 2018 |
|
|||||||
LORD EDWARD DERBY | Trustee | 11 June 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £50.05k | £31.95k | £45.18k | £14.60k | £26.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £52.93k | £15.87k | £44.28k | £7.02k | £24.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 01 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 01 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 12 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 24 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 24 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 25 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 25 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 28 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 28 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS DATED 18 AUGUST 2006 AS AMENDED 5 MARCH 2008 AS AMENDED BY TRUST MODIFICATION ORDER DATED 22 MAR 2022 as amended on 22 Jun 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS THE PROVISION OF- (A) ITEMS, SERVICES, FACILITIES AND GRANTS FOR THE SCHOOL AND (B) SCHOLARSHIPS, MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES OR OTHER FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF THE SCHOOL’S CURRENT OR FUTURE PUPILS OR ITS (OR A PREDECESSOR SCHOOL’S) PAST PUPILS UNDER THE AGE OF 25 OR THEIR PREPARATION FOR ENTRY INTO A PROFESSION, TRADE OR CALLING PROVIDED THAT ANY ITEMS, SERVICES, FACILITIES OR GRANTS FOR THE SCHOOL SHALL BE OF A KIND NOT NORMALLY FUNDED BY THE LOCAL AUTHORITY OR CENTRAL GOVERNMENT.
Linked charities
- 25 October 1988 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
Fairhaven
189 Wigan Road
Lathom
ORMSKIRK
Lancashire
- Phone:
- 01695583040
- Email:
- pjd@ormskirk.lancs.sch.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window