THE LIVERPOOL COUNCIL OF EDUCATION (INCORPORATED)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity was incorporated in 1925 to act as a trustee of various charitable funds and to promote and encourage education, in particular by assisting schools and pupils in Liverpool. It continues to operate by making grants to Liverpool schools and pupils of Liverpool schools.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Liverpool City
Governance
- 28 April 1964: Standard registration
- 02 September 2018: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- Liverpool Education Grants Charitable Trust (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Conor Foley | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Jennifer Holder | Trustee | 23 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Jeremy Paul Grice | Trustee | 30 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||
David Francis Blythe | Trustee | 12 December 2018 |
|
|||||||
Councillor Barbara Ann Murray | Trustee | 12 December 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Chantelle Day | Trustee | 20 September 2017 |
|
|
||||||
JOHN PRINCE | Trustee | 27 March 2017 |
|
|||||||
ROGER MORRIS | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.91k | £16.02k | £21.97k | £26.95k | £31.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.59k | £84.11k | £15.37k | £28.45k | £56.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 30 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 30 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 16 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 16 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 25 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 26 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 17 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 25 SEP 1925 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16 JAN 1950 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11 JAN 1961 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14 JUL 2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS TO PROMOTE AND ENCOURAGE EDUCATION BY EVERY AVAILABLE MEANS, IN PARTICULAR, BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING, BY: (1) A SYSTEM OF SCHOLARSHIP PRIZES AND REWARDS; (2) GENERAL CO-OPERATION WITH THE MANAGERS AND TEACHERS OF ALL SCHOOLS AND OTHERS INTERESTED IN THE PRACTICAL WORK OF EDUCATION IN LIVERPOOL AND ITS NEIGHBOURING AREAS BUT WITHOUT INTERFERENCE WITH THE FINANCIAL OR GENERAL MANAGEMENT OF ANY INDIVIDUAL SCHOOL; (3) PAYMENTS BY WAY OF GIFT OR LOAN FOR THE MAINTENANCE OF CHILDREN AND ADULTS WITH A VIEW TO ENABLING THEM TO TAKE ADVANTAGE OF SCHOLARSHIPS AND OTHER EDUCATIONAL OPPORTUNITIES; (4) GIFTS OR REMUNERATION TO ANY INDIVIDUAL OR ORGANISATION WITH THE OBJECT OF PROMOTING OR ENCOURAGING EDUCATION
Area of benefit
CITY AND COUNTY BOROUGH OF LIVERPOOL
Linked charities
- 28 April 1964 : Standard registration
- 02 September 2018 : Removed
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 ST. ANNES ROAD
AIGBURTH
LIVERPOOL
L17 6BW
- Phone:
- 01514271766
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window