Accounts and annual returns LANCASTER FESTIVAL OF BRITAIN ENDOWMENTS

Charity number: 526735
Charity reporting is overdue by 463 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 97 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 97 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 463 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 463 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 05 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 19 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 17 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required