Linked charities WADE DEACON HIGH SCHOOL AND WIDNES SIXTH FORM COLLEGE PRIZE FUND
Charity number: 526755
Removed charity
Linked charities
Governing document
WILL PROVED AT LIVERPOOL D P R ON 10 SEPTEMBER 1964 AND SCHEMES OF 9 MAY 1979 AND 30 JANUARY 1989 (DATE OF REGISTRATION RECORDED AS GD 30/01/89 AS ALSO MAIN CHARITY)
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION OF A SCHOLARSHIP TO BE AWARDED ANNUALLY AND ANY SURPLUS INCOME TO BE USED FOR GENERAL PURPOSES OF THE WADE DEACON COUNTY HIGH SCHOOL OR OF WIDNES SIXTH FORM COLLEGE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
- 30 January 1989 : Standard registration
- 27 August 2009 : Removed
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.