SIR JOHN DEANE'S COLLEGE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Management of the Endowment Fund to provide grants to individual students and to the College for equipment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
Governance
- 17 March 1965: Standard registration
- 05 August 1994: Removed
- FOUNDATION SCHEME OR ESTATES GOVERNORS (Working name)
- SIR JOHN DEANE'S GRAMMER SCHOOL FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- SIR JOHN DEANE'S SIXTH FORM COLLEGE FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DOUG SHINGLER | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Michael Cooksley | Trustee | 10 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robert Cermik | Trustee | 26 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Atherton | Trustee | 11 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Carol Bulman | Trustee | 14 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Keith Charlton | Trustee | 15 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Reed | Trustee | 15 October 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.65k | £14.07k | £15.47k | £16.05k | £18.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.09k | £13.04k | £14.48k | £11.13k | £19.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 9 JANUARY 2001 AS AMENDED ON 15 OCT 2012 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 09 MAR 2018
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION OF ITEMS, SERVICES AND FACILITIES FOR THE COLLEGE. IF AND INSOFAR AS THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY CANNOT BE APPLIED TOWARDS THE ABOVE OBJECT IT MAY BE APPLIED IN PROMOTING THE EDUCATION OF PERSONS WHO ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE IN THE FOLLOWING ORDER OF PRIORITY(A) PERSONS WHO ARE ATTENDING THE COLLEGE; AND (B) PERSONS WHO HAVE AT ANY TIME ATTENDED THE COLLEGE; AND (C) PERSONS UNDER THE AGE OF 25 RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
NORTHWICH
Linked charities
- 17 March 1965 : Standard registration
- 05 August 1994 : Removed
Contact information
- Address:
-
SIR JOHN DEANES COLLEGE
MONARCH DRIVE
NORTHWICH
CW9 8AF
- Phone:
- 01606810020
- Email:
- armstrong_s@sjd.ac.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window