Trustees SIR JOHN DEANE'S COLLEGE FOUNDATION
Charity number: 526765

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DOUG SHINGLER | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Michael Cooksley | Trustee | 10 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robert Cermik | Trustee | 26 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Atherton | Trustee | 11 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Carol Bulman | Trustee | 14 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Keith Charlton | Trustee | 15 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Reed | Trustee | 15 October 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.