LANGWATHBY PAROCHIAL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objectives of the foundation are: - Assisting boys and girls for the purposes of education other than elementary; - Attending to health or physical condition of children attending public elementary schools; - Otherwise promoting education, including social and physical training, of boys and girls of the poorer classes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Cumbria
Governance
- 04 December 1964: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID JOHN THRELKELD | Chair |
|
||||||
Sarah Greenop | Trustee | 03 September 2024 |
|
|||||
Kerry Little | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
John Michael Doidge-Harrison | Trustee | 01 November 2014 |
|
|||||
PAM RADCLIFFE | Trustee | 27 November 2012 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £693 | £625 | £581 | £1.10k | £1.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £670 | £460 | £1.03k | £565 | £300 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 July 2024 | 261 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 08 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 02 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 02 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 5 SEPTEMBER 1930 AND SCHEME OF 2 MAY 1974
Charitable objects
1. ASSISTING BOYS AND GIRLS FOR PURPOSES OF EDUCATION OTHER THAN ELEMENTARY. 2. ATTENDING TO HEALTH OR PHYSICAL CONDITION OF CHILDREN ATTENDING PUBLIC ELEMENTARY SCHOOLS. 3. OTHERWISE PROMOTING EDUCATION, INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING, OF BOYS AND GIRLS OF THE POORER CLASSES.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF LANGWATHBY
Contact information
- Address:
-
11 Low Farm
Langwathby
PENRITH
Cumbria
CA10 1NH
- Phone:
- 01768 881179
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window