SETMURTHY EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
(i) Makes grants to children of Secondary School age and those going on in Further Education, towards their educational expenses, who are resident within the Parish of Setmurthy. (ii) Makes grants towards the upkeep of Setmurthy Parish Hall which is used for Educational Classes. (iii) Makes grants towards the running costs of the above Educational Classes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Cumbria
Governance
- 23 April 1965: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Julia FISHER | Chair | 18 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alexander Setmurthy Fisher | Trustee | 25 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
CAROLE RICHARDSON | Trustee | 18 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
GORDON PICKERING | Trustee |
|
||||||
NICOLA JEAN LAWS | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2019 | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.89k | £998 | £1.88k | £1.88k | £1.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.70k | £2.11k | £2.00k | £2.00k | £2.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 7 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 7 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 09 July 2024 | 70 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 04 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 17 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 19 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 30TH SEPTEMBER 1936
Charitable objects
1. ANNUAL PAYMENT TO TRUSTEES OF FORMER CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOL PREMISES SO LONG AS THEY ARE USED FOR THE BENEFIT OF CHILDREN AND ADULTS OR CHILDREN ONLY OF THE LABOURING MANUFACTURING AND OTHER POORER CLASSES. 2. ASSISTING BOYS AND GIRLS FOR PURPOSES OF EDUCATION OTHER THAN ELEMENTARY OR TO ENABLE THEM TO PREPARE FOR SOME PROFESSION, TRADE, OCCUPATION OR SERVICE. 3. OTHERWISE PROMOTING THE EDUCATION, INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING OF BOYS AND GIRLS OF THE POORER CLASSES. 4. PROVIDING SPECIAL FACILITIES FOR CHILDREN OR YOUNG PERSONS IN SUBJECTS OF PRACTICAL OR TECHNICAL INSTRUCTION.
Area of benefit
ANCIENT TOWNSHIP OF SETMURTHY
Contact information
- Address:
-
BANKS POINT
BASSENTHWAITE LAKE
COCKERMOUTH
CA13 9YD
- Phone:
- 01768776549
- Email:
- gordonpickering@uk2.net
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window