Accounts and annual returns LOWESWATER VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 526856
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2023 24 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2022 09 September 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2021 20 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2021 20 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2020 26 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2019 02 April 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 Not Required