Financial history LOWESWATER VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 526856
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2019 30/11/2020 30/11/2021 30/11/2022 30/11/2023
Total gross income £15.66k £24.57k £25.53k £8.09k £12.60k
Total expenditure £8.06k £9.61k £11.36k £9.55k £10.19k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £15.00k £18.67k N/A N/A