LOWESWATER VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Village Hall is used by the local community and wider area for meetings, parties etc. We hold fundraising events such as teas to raise money to maintain and improve the Hall to keep it in use. We are parts of Arts out West and bring a variety of theatre, music and comedy acts out into the local area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cumbria
Governance
- 31 December 1979: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andy Burr | Chair | 09 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter Colin Winfindale | Trustee | 08 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Watson | Trustee | 09 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Anne Robinson | Trustee | 09 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Roger Hiley | Trustee | 09 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lyn Furniss | Trustee | 09 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Bird Robinson | Trustee | 09 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Severs | Trustee | 02 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Penny Leck | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS VAL BELL | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.66k | £24.57k | £25.53k | £8.09k | £12.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.06k | £9.61k | £11.36k | £9.55k | £10.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £15.00k | £18.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 24 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 09 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 20 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | 20 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 26 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 02 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 4 MAY 1955
Charitable objects
1. CLASSES FOR RELIGIOUS INSTRUCTION. 2. EVENING OR OTHER CLASSES FOR INSTRUCTION IN SECULAR SUBJECTS OR LECTURES OF AN EDUCATION CHARACTER. 3. PHYSICAL INSTRUCTION BY MEANS OF A GYMNASIUM OR OTHERWISE. 4. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION BY MEANS OF A LIBRARY OR READING ROOM AND THE PROVISION OF A SOCIAL AND PHYSICA TRAINING.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF LOWESWATER AND SURROUNDING DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Coach House
Loweswater
COCKERMOUTH
Cumbria
CA13 0RS
- Phone:
- 0190085980
- Email:
- andyburrconsult@gmail.com
- Website:
-
loweswatervillagehall.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window