THE BATTERSBY HALL CHARITY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Running a hall for the benefit of local residents.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cumbria
Governance
- 16 February 1966: Standard registration
- 11 August 1997: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- THE BATTERSBY LIBRARY LECTURE HALL AND PLACE OF EDUCATION (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.71k | £12.56k | £249.51k | £5.92k | £19.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.40k | £3.76k | £7.61k | £447 | £2.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | 23 October 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | 28 October 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 31 October 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | 01 November 2016 | 1 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 4 FEBRUARY 1997
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A HALL FOR THE EDUCATION AND USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF KESWICK WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL,RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE OF MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
TOWN AND NEIGHBOURHOOD OF KESWICK
Linked charities
- 16 February 1966 : Standard registration
- 11 August 1997 : Removed
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window