RICHARD O'SULLIVAN Q C PRIZE FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Prize awarded to a student in the Faculty of Law at Manchester University who achieves the best result in the examination of LW2102 Jurisprudence
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Manchester City
Governance
- 18 April 1978: Standard registration
- 17 March 2020: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2014 | 31/07/2015 | 31/07/2016 | 31/07/2017 | 31/07/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11 | £13 | £9 | £10 | £12 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £10 | £10 | £10 | £10 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2018 | 31 May 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2017 | 22 May 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2016 | 31 May 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2016 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 1ST APRIL 1965
Charitable objects
THE AWARD OF AN ANNUAL PRIZE TO A STUDENT CERTIFIED BY THE MANCHESTER UNIVERSITY TO HAVE THE HIGHEST MARKS IN JURISPRUDENCE AND COMPARATIVE LAW AT THE MANCHESTER UNIVERSITY LL.B. EXAMINATION EACH YEAR.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window