THE JARVIS EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity is established to promote education in the Parishes of Staunton-on-Wye, Bredwardine & Letton. Land and buildings at Staunton-on-Wye are used for the purpose of a voluntary school.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Herefordshire
Governance
- 14 June 1979: Standard registration
- JARVIS EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RICHARD JAMES SKYRME | Chair |
|
||||||
ANNETTE ANDREWS | Trustee | 14 June 2021 |
|
|||||
Rev Philip Harvey | Trustee | 14 June 2021 |
|
|||||
Stephen William Williams | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|||||
ANDY JOHNSON | Trustee | 26 March 2019 |
|
|||||
NIGEL SELLAR | Trustee | 28 January 2014 |
|
|||||
MARTIN POWELL | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30.37k | £24.35k | £26.52k | £25.69k | £27.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £58.41k | £36.45k | £39.53k | £42.25k | £56.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 19 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 19 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
REGULATION SCHEME DATED 21 SEPTEMBER 1976, AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 27 SEPTEMBER 2002
Charitable objects
FOR PROMOTING THE EDUCATION OF PERSONS UNDER THE AGE OF 25 YEARS WHO ARE RESIDENTS IN THE COUNTY OF HEREFORD AND WORCESTER AND WHO ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE (PREFERENCE BEING GIVEN TO PERSONS WHO ARE RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF THE PARISHES OF STAUNTON-ON-WYE, BREDWARDINE AND LETTON). FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE SCHEME SEALED 21 SEPTEMBER 1976.
Area of benefit
PARISHES OF STAUNTON-ON-WYE, BREDWARDINE AND LETTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flintsham Court
Titley
Kington
HR5 3RG
- Phone:
- 07929650290
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window