THE KENDAL CENTRAL SCHOOL FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- Cumbria
Governance
- 25 November 1965: Standard registration
- 09 May 2010: Removed (Does not operate)
- KENDAL CENTRAL CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOL (Previous name)
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2005 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 26 JUNE 1991
Charitable objects
INCOME OF THE CHARITY IN THE FOLLOWING WAYS AND IN THE FOLLOWING ORDER OF PRIORITY :- 1. IN PROVIDING SPECIAL BENEFITS FOR THE VICARAGE PARK SCHOOL, KENDAL. 2. IN PROVIDING SPECIAL BENEFITS FOR ANY VOLUNTARY CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOL SUBSTANTIALLY SERVING KENDALL. 3. IN PROMOTING THE RELIGIOUS EDUCATION OF PERSONS UNDER THE AGE OF 25 YEARS WHO ARE RESIDENT IN KENDAL IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PRINCIPLES AND DOCTRINES OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND BY MEANS OF SUNDAY SCHOOLS OR IN SUCH OTHER WAYS AS THE TRUSTEE THINKS FIT. 4. IN AWARDING TO PERSONS UNDER THE AGE OF 25 YEARS RESIDENT IN KENDAL SCHOLARSHIPS, EXHIBITIONS, BURSARIES, MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES OR GRANTS TENABLE AT ANY SCHOOL, UNIVERSITY, COLLEGE OF EDUCATION, OR OTHER INSTITUTION OF FURTHER (INCLUDING PROFESSIONAL AND TECHNICAL) EDUCATION APPROVED FOR THE PURPOSES BY THE TRUSTEE
Area of benefit
KENDAL
Linked charities
- 25 November 1965 : Standard registration
- 09 May 2010 : Removed
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window