SCHOOL CHARITY OF JOHN BRAITHWAITE

Charity Number: 526910
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provides extra financial support for the school in areas and activities outside normal Local Authority funding.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £251
Total expenditure: £50

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Cumbria

Governance

Registration history:
  • 26 May 1965: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • ST MARYS C E NURSERY AND INFANT SCHOOL WINDERMERE (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Investment
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Matthew Thomas Towe Chair 03 December 2020
None on record
Emma Louise Graham Trustee 11 July 2024
None on record
Paul Parry FCA Trustee 11 July 2024
None on record
Rev JAMES JOHNSTON RICHARDS Trustee 01 September 2013
THOMAS COLLINSON
Received: On time
CHARITY OF MISS HANNAH COLLINSON
Received: On time
MARY ELIZABETH ULLOCK
Received: On time
WINDERMERE SCHOOL ENDOWMENT
Received: On time
BOWNESS AND WINDERMERE COMMUNITY CARE TRUST
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARTIN, WINDERMERE
Received: On time
MICHAEL GEOFFREY BALDWIN Trustee
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARTIN, WINDERMERE
Received: On time
THOMAS COLLINSON
Received: On time
CHARITY OF MISS HANNAH COLLINSON
Received: On time
MARY ELIZABETH ULLOCK
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £260 £232 £303 £30 £251
Total expenditure £550 £50 £650 £50 £50
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 12 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 19 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 23 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 16 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 11 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
DUNIRA
KENDAL ROAD
BOWNESS-ON-WINDERMERE
WINDERMERE
LA23 3ER
Phone:
01539442270
Website:

No information available